NJ S2498 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - Substituted by A3888 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Allows issuance of additional alcoholic beverage licenses within boundaries of formerly federally owned or operated military installations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allows issuance of additional alcoholic beverage licenses within boundaries of formerly federally owned or operated military installations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-01SenateSubstituted by A3888 (2R)
2018-06-25SenateSenate Amendment (29-0) (Gopal)
2018-04-16SenateIntroduced, 1st Reading without Reference, 2nd Reading

Same As/Similar To

A3888 (Same As) 2018-06-30 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (67-2-2)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback