NJ S2496 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S769
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-11 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-11 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows municipal clerks to receive hand delivered voted mail-in ballots and applications; extends ballot receipt and election certification deadlines; increases certain messenger and bearer ballot limits.
Title
Allows municipal clerks to receive hand delivered voted mail-in ballots and applications; extends ballot receipt and election certification deadlines; increases certain messenger and bearer ballot limits.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Sarlo [D] | Sen. Nellie Pou [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-11 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-11 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Transferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2020-05-28 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2496 (Carry Over) 2020-06-11 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A4259 (Same As) 2020-08-13 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A4259 (Same As) 2020-08-13 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee