NJ S2494 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires certain schools to establish emergency action plans for responding to serious or potentially life-threatening sports-related injuries.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires certain schools to establish emergency action plans for responding to serious or potentially life-threatening sports-related injuries.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
2019-06-20SenatePassed by the Senate (38-0)
2019-06-17SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-04-16SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4723 (Same As) 2018-11-26 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback