NJ S2488 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future S2379
Note: Carry Foward to future A3828

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Engrossed on August 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-24 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Allocates $50 million to Department of Labor and Workforce Development from federal government assistance to improve unemployment insurance benefit claims processing capacity.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allocates $50 million to Department of Labor and Workforce Development from federal government assistance to improve unemployment insurance benefit claims processing capacity.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-24 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-10 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-24AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2020-09-14AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
2020-08-27SenatePassed by the Senate (39-0)
2020-08-10SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2020-05-14SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2488 (Carry Over) 2021-02-24 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S2488 (Carry Over) 2021-02-24 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A4380 (Same As) 2021-02-24 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback