NJ S2485 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 29 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits eviction as remedy for nonpayment of rent due during time surrounding COVID-19 pandemic in certain circumstances.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits eviction as remedy for nonpayment of rent due during time surrounding COVID-19 pandemic in certain circumstances.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 23 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-02AssemblyReceived in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
2020-06-29SenatePassed by the Senate (23-15)
2020-06-15SenateSenate Amendment (29-0) (Stack)
2020-06-11SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2020-05-14SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4228 (Same As) 2020-06-25 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback