NJ S2482 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Introduced on May 14 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-12-17 - Motion To Table (24-15) (Weinberg)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Limits to 14 days effective period of certain emergency orders, rules, or regulations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Limits to 14 days effective period of certain emergency orders, rules, or regulations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Table Motion (Y: 20 N: 14 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-12-17SenateMotion To Table (24-15) (Weinberg)
2020-12-17SenateMotion To Relieve from Committee (Doherty)
2020-10-29SenateMotion To Table (20-14) (Weinberg)
2020-10-29SenateMotion To Relieve from Committee (Testa)
2020-05-14SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4147 (Same As) 2021-05-20 - Motion To Table (44-25-0) (Greenwald)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback