NJ S248 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S325
Note: Carry Foward to future A2759
Note: Carry Over of previous S3884
Note: Carry Over of previous A5668
Note: Carry Foward to future A2759
Note: Carry Over of previous S3884
Note: Carry Over of previous A5668
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-05 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
Pending: Assembly Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-05 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
Pending: Assembly Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires NJHMFA to allocate certain portion of federal low-income housing tax credits to certain high-opportunity areas.
Title
Requires NJHMFA to allocate certain portion of federal low-income housing tax credits to certain high-opportunity areas.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (24-13) |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S248 (Carry Over) 2020-03-05 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
S248 (Carry Over) 2020-03-05 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
S3884 (Carry Over) 2019-06-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A3660 (Same As) 2020-03-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
A5668 (Carry Over) 2019-06-24 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
S248 (Carry Over) 2020-03-05 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
S3884 (Carry Over) 2019-06-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A3660 (Same As) 2020-03-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
A5668 (Carry Over) 2019-06-24 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee