NJ S2475 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on May 11 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-07-30 - Substituted by A3971 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the issuance of "coronavirus relief bonds" by municipalities and counties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the issuance of "coronavirus relief bonds" by municipalities and counties.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-07-28 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-30SenateSubstituted by A3971 (1R)
2020-07-28SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2020-07-22SenateTransferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2020-05-11SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee

Same As/Similar To

A3971 (Same As) 2020-07-30 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Assembly

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback