NJ S2475 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1133
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Vetoed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits application of fiduciary standard to insurance producers; specifies qualifications of persons providing affidavit of merit in lawsuits against insurance producers. *
Title
Prohibits application of fiduciary standard to insurance producers; specifies qualifications of persons providing affidavit of merit in lawsuits against insurance producers. *
Sponsors
Sen. Stephen Sweeney [D] | Sen. Nellie Pou [D] | Rep. Craig Coughlin [D] | Sen. John McKeon [D] |
Rep. BettyLou DeCroce [R] | Rep. Carol Murphy [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A2034 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | Senate | Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (75-0-0) |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Substituted for A2034 (3R) |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (32-0) |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Senate Amendment (32-0) (Pou) |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2475 (Carry Over) 2019-05-13 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate
A2034 (Same As) 2019-02-25 - Substituted by S2475 (2R)
A2034 (Same As) 2019-02-25 - Substituted by S2475 (2R)