NJ S2468 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on August 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-08 - Approved P.L.2013, c.110.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on August 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-08 - Approved P.L.2013, c.110.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes impoundment of motor vehicles for certain crimes and offenses.
Title
Authorizes impoundment of motor vehicles for certain crimes and offenses.
Sponsors
Sen. Donald Norcross [D] | Sen. Christopher Bateman [R] | Rep. Gilbert Wilson [D] | Sen. Diane Allen [R] |
Rep. Craig Coughlin [D] | Sen. Robert Gordon [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-06-27 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A4180 Aa (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A4180 Aa (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-08 | Senate | Approved P.L.2013, c.110. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-0) |
2013-06-24 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2013-06-24 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (73-0-5) |
2013-06-24 | Assembly | Substituted for A4180 (1R) |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Wilson) |
2013-06-06 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2013-05-13 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (36-0) |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4180 (Same As) 2013-06-24 - Substituted by S2468 (3R)