NJ S2463 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on January 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-09 - Approved P.L.2016, c.90.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on January 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-09 - Approved P.L.2016, c.90.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the time when child placement review hearings are initiated from 45 days to 60 days.
Title
Changes the time when child placement review hearings are initiated from 45 days to 60 days.
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Vitale [D] | Sen. Ronald Rice [D] | Sen. Diane Allen [R] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] |
Rep. Pamela Lampitt [D] | Sen. Raj Mukherji [D] | Sen. Patrick Diegnan [D] | Rep. Nancy Munoz [R] |
Rep. Craig Coughlin [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-11-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A3892 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-20 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-20 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-09 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2016, c.90. |
2016-11-21 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (71-0-0) |
2016-11-21 | Assembly | Substituted for A3892 |
2016-11-14 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2016-11-14 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (34-0) |
2016-10-20 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-07-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3892 (Same As) 2016-11-21 - Substituted by S2463