NJ S2455 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A5225

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on December 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-17 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Transfers county college employees and retirees from membership in SEHBP to membership in SHBP.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transfers county college employees and retirees from membership in SEHBP to membership in SHBP.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-10-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A2001 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 16 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-17SenateAbsolute Veto, Received in the Senate
2018-10-29AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (55-16-3)
2018-10-29AssemblySubstituted for A2001
2018-06-18AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-06-18AssemblyTransferred to Assembly Budget Committee
2018-05-07AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
2018-04-12SenatePassed by the Senate (22-12)
2018-04-05SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-04-05SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee

Same As/Similar To

A2001 (Same As) 2018-10-29 - Substituted by S2455
A5225 (Carry Over) 2017-12-04 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback