NJ S2448 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A525
Note: Carry Over of previous A829
Note: Carry Over of previous A829
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on December 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-06 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Pending: Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-06 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Pending: Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Waives certain professional and occupational licensing fees for veterans and spouses of veterans.
Title
Waives certain professional and occupational licensing fees for veterans and spouses of veterans.
Sponsors
Sen. Patrick Diegnan [D] | Sen. Troy Singleton [D] | Sen. Anthony R. Bucco [R] | Sen. Chris Brown [R] |
Sen. Nilsa Cruz-Perez [D] | Sen. Vin Gopal [D] | Sen. Fred Madden [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-12-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-05 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-27 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-05 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-27 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-06 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
2019-12-16 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (40-0) |
2019-12-05 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-09-27 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2018-09-27 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2448 (Carry Over) 2020-01-06 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
A373 (Same As) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
A829 (Carry Over) 2016-01-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
A373 (Same As) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
A829 (Carry Over) 2016-01-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee