NJ S2446 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A4961

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on April 5 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-25 - Substituted by A837 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires public utility to charge veterans' organization residential rate for service delivered to property at which veterans' organization primarily operates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires public utility to charge veterans' organization residential rate for service delivered to property at which veterans' organization primarily operates.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-14 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-25SenateSubstituted by A837 (1R)
2018-05-14SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-04-05SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee

Same As/Similar To

A837 (Same As) 2018-08-10 - Approved P.L.2018, c.77.
A4961 (Carry Over) 2017-06-08 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback