NJ S2433 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-29 - Substituted by A4037 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-29 - Substituted by A4037 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires electronic signature and submission process for all candidate, recall, initiative, and referendum petitions for remaining 2020 elections and thereafter during COVID-19 emergency.
Title
Requires electronic signature and submission process for all candidate, recall, initiative, and referendum petitions for remaining 2020 elections and thereafter during COVID-19 emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Vin Gopal [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-29 | Senate | Substituted by A4037 (1R) |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Transferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4037 (Same As) 2020-07-01 - Approved P.L.2020, c.55.