NJ S2432 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on August 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-15 - Approved P.L.2019, c.244.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on August 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-15 - Approved P.L.2019, c.244.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Permits recovery of uncompensated medical expenses in civil action for damages arising from automobile accident. *
Title
Permits recovery of uncompensated medical expenses in civil action for damages arising from automobile accident. *
Sponsors
Sen. Nicholas Scutari [D] | Sen. Nellie Pou [D] | Rep. Joann Downey [D] | Sen. Jon Bramnick [R] |
Rep. Annette Quijano [D] | Rep. Craig Coughlin [D] | Rep. Mila Jasey [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A5371 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 3 NV: 22 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 23 N: 8 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 3 NV: 22 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 23 N: 8 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-15 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2019, c.244. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (55-3-10) |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Substituted for A5371 |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (23-8) |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Emergency Resolution (30-1) (Scutari) |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Senate Amendment (24-0) (Scutari) |
2018-06-11 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5371 (Same As) 2019-05-23 - Substituted by S2432 (1R)