NJ S2412 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-30 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
Pending: Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-30 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
Pending: Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires refund or credit for certain transient and short-term rental reservations when public health emergency or state of emergency is in effect.
Title
Requires refund or credit for certain transient and short-term rental reservations when public health emergency or state of emergency is in effect.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-30 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee |
2020-07-30 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (31-6) |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Senate Amendment (26-0) (Cryan) |
2020-05-28 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4146 (Same As) 2020-05-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee