NJ S2412 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 18 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-18 - Substituted by A3628 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 18 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-18 - Substituted by A3628 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
"Water Infrastructure Protection Act."
Title
"Water Infrastructure Protection Act."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-15 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-15 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 20 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-12-01 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-01 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-01 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-01 - Senate - Senate Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-09 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-15 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 20 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-12-01 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-01 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-01 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-01 - Senate - Senate Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-09 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-18 | Senate | Substituted by A3628 (1R) |
2014-12-15 | Senate | Senate Amendment (20-0) (Sarlo) |
2014-12-01 | Senate | Senate Amendment (24-0) (Sarlo) |
2014-10-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-10-09 | Senate | Transferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2014-09-18 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3628 (Same As) 2015-02-05 - Approved P.L.2015, c.18.