NJ S2410 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on May 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-19 - Substituted by A4004 (4R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-19 - Substituted by A4004 (4R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes Coronavirus Disease 2019 (COVID-19) Pandemic Task Force on Racial and Health Disparities.
Title
Establishes Coronavirus Disease 2019 (COVID-19) Pandemic Task Force on Racial and Health Disparities.
Sponsors
Sen. Sandra Cunningham [D] | Sen. Nellie Pou [D] | Sen. Robert Singer [R] | Sen. Vin Gopal [D] |
Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] | Sen. Troy Singleton [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-08 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-08 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-19 | Senate | Substituted by A4004 (4R) |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Senate Amendment (26-0) (Pou) |
2020-10-29 | Senate | Senate Amendment (27-0) (Cunningham) |
2020-10-08 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4004 (Same As) 2021-06-11 - Approved P.L.2021, c.106.