NJ S2403 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Approved P.L.2017, c.127.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes Women's Vocational Training Pilot Program to promote economic self-sufficiency of low-income women through increased participation in high-wage, high-demand occupations; authorizes allocation of certain funds therefor.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes Women's Vocational Training Pilot Program to promote economic self-sufficiency of low-income women through increased participation in high-wage, high-demand occupations; authorizes allocation of certain funds therefor.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A3717 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-26 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-21AssemblyApproved P.L.2017, c.127.
2017-06-22AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (72-3-0)
2017-06-22AssemblySubstituted for A3717 (1R)
2017-06-19AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2017-03-16AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2017-03-13SenatePassed by the Senate (37-0)
2017-02-27SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2016-09-26SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2016-09-26SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2016-06-23SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee

Same As/Similar To

A3717 (Same As) 2017-06-22 - Substituted by S2403 (1R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback