NJ S2402 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on June 23 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-22 - Substituted by A3944
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 23 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-22 - Substituted by A3944
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DOE to develop educational fact sheet for distribution to parents of student-athletes and cheerleaders concerning use and misuse of prescription opioids.
Title
Requires DOE to develop educational fact sheet for distribution to parents of student-athletes and cheerleaders concerning use and misuse of prescription opioids.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-18 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-22 | Senate | Substituted by A3944 |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-06-23 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3944 (Same As) 2017-07-21 - Approved P.L.2017, c.167.