NJ S2400 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-03 - Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-03 - Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides temporary modifications to payment and use of certain casino gaming taxes and fees; permanently redefines promotional gaming credits to include certain coupons and table game wagers; requires priority funding for senior and disabled transportation services.
Title
Provides temporary modifications to payment and use of certain casino gaming taxes and fees; permanently redefines promotional gaming credits to include certain coupons and table game wagers; requires priority funding for senior and disabled transportation services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur in House Amendments (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4032 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-22 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor: Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 4 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4032 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-22 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor: Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 4 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-03 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Concur by Senate Amendments (36-1) |
2020-10-08 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2020-09-24 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (71-5-3) |
2020-09-24 | Assembly | Substituted for A4032 (1R) |
2020-09-21 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-09-21 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Budget Committee |
2020-09-14 | Assembly | Recommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2020-06-15 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (28-4) |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Emergency Resolution (34-1) (Brown) |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Senate Amendment (31-0) (Sweeney) |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Transferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4032 (Same As) 2020-09-24 - Substituted by S2400 (3R)