NJ S2388 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-05-28 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes certain forms of testing for cornavirus disease 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes certain forms of testing for cornavirus disease 2019.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-07 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-28AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
2020-05-14SenatePassed by the Senate (40-0)
2020-05-07SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2020-05-04SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4968 (Same As) 2020-11-12 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback