NJ S2370 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-06 - Approved P.L.2017, c.11.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-06 - Approved P.L.2017, c.11.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes operation of lottery courier services.
Title
Authorizes operation of lottery courier services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-12-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A3904 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 22 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-05 - Assembly - Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-01 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 8 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-07-14 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 22 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-05 - Assembly - Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-01 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 8 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-07-14 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-06 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2017, c.11. |
2016-12-19 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (50-22-4) |
2016-12-19 | Assembly | Substituted for A3904 |
2016-12-05 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-09-08 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee |
2016-08-01 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (26-8) |
2016-07-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-06-16 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3904 (Same As) 2016-12-19 - Substituted by S2370