NJ S2364 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-16 - Approved P.L.2015, c.23.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-16 - Approved P.L.2015, c.23.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires local unit approval of applications for participation in federal 1033 program.
Title
Requires local unit approval of applications for participation in federal 1033 program.
Sponsors
Sen. Nia Gill [D] | Sen. Loretta Weinberg [D] | Sen. Gordon Johnson [D] | Rep. Ronald Dancer [R] |
Rep. Reed Gusciora [D] | Sen. Michael Doherty [R] | Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-01-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A3901 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A3901 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-12 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-11 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A3901 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-12 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-11 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-16 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2015, c.23. |
2015-01-29 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (70-0-0) |
2015-01-29 | Assembly | Substituted for A3901 (1R) |
2015-01-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2015-01-12 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
2014-12-18 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (36-0) |
2014-12-11 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-09-18 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3901 (Same As) 2015-01-29 - Substituted by S2364 (1R)