NJ S2363 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on August 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-19 - Approved P.L.2013, c.144.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Requires home improvement contractors to display State-issued identification badge; requires surrender in certain circumstances; imposes penalty for improper display of badge.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires home improvement contractors to display State-issued identification badge; requires surrender in certain circumstances; imposes penalty for improper display of badge.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-06-20 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A4025 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-08-19SenateApproved P.L.2013, c.144.
2013-06-20SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (39-1)
2013-05-20SenateReceived in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2013-05-20AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (73-4-0)
2013-05-20AssemblySubstituted for A4025 (1R)
2013-05-06AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2013-03-21AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee
2013-03-18SenatePassed by the Senate (37-1)
2013-02-04SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2012-11-29SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4025 (Same As) 2013-05-20 - Substituted by S2363 (2R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback