NJ S2362 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A2813
Note: Carry Over of previous S1598
Note: Carry Over of previous S1598
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-29 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Pending: Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-29 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Pending: Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates gallery space on State House grounds for display of certain art works.
Title
Creates gallery space on State House grounds for display of certain art works.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-29 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3032 (Same As) 2024-05-16 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A2813 (Carry Over) 2023-01-26 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Wimberly)
S1598 (Carry Over) 2022-03-24 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
A2813 (Carry Over) 2023-01-26 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Wimberly)
S1598 (Carry Over) 2022-03-24 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/S2362 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/S2500/2362_I1.HTM |