NJ S2360 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 16 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-25 - Substituted by A3056 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires Department of Agriculture to develop voluntary guidelines to encourage school districts and institutions of higher education to donate excess food; extends "Food Bank Good Samaritan Act" protections to school districts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires Department of Agriculture to develop voluntary guidelines to encourage school districts and institutions of higher education to donate excess food; extends "Food Bank Good Samaritan Act" protections to school districts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-25SenateSubstituted by A3056 (2R)
2017-03-13SenateReported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
2017-02-27SenateTransferred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
2016-06-16SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee

Same As/Similar To

A3056 (Same As) 2017-08-07 - Approved P.L.2017, c.210.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback