NJ S2360 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Enrolled on June 11 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-12-03 - Motion To Table (47-31-0) (Greenwald)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires notification of local law enforcement prior to expungement of certain mental health records of prospective firearms purchasers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires notification of local law enforcement prior to expungement of certain mental health records of prospective firearms purchasers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-12-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Table Motion (Y: 47 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: Veto Override (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A3593 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A3593 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-12-03AssemblyMotion To Table (47-31-0) (Greenwald)
2015-12-03AssemblyMotion To Reconsider (DeCroce)
2015-11-09AssemblyReceived in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
2015-10-22SenateConditional Override Passed Senate (27-12)
2015-08-10SenateConditional Veto, Received in the Senate
2015-06-11AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (74-0-0)
2015-06-11AssemblySubstituted for A3593
2015-06-01AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2015-03-19AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
2015-03-16SenatePassed by the Senate (39-0)
2015-01-29SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2014-09-15SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee

Same As/Similar To

A2068 (Same As) 2014-01-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
A3593 (Same As) 2015-06-11 - Substituted by S2360

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback