NJ S2356 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A2715

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 5 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-09-13 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires annual evaluation reports by Commissioner of Labor and Workforce Development on survey responses to be obtained from certain employers that end operations in this State.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires annual evaluation reports by Commissioner of Labor and Workforce Development on survey responses to be obtained from certain employers that end operations in this State.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-09-13 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-13SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2018-09-13SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-04-05SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee

Same As/Similar To

A1392 (Same As) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
A2715 (Carry Over) 2016-02-08 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback