NJ S2355 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on July 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Approved P.L.2020, c.46.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on July 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Approved P.L.2020, c.46.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Delays mandatory retirement in SPRS when it would occur during period of state of emergency; extends eligibility for appointment as member of State Police and enrollment in SPRS for 160th Class of NJ State Police.
Title
Delays mandatory retirement in SPRS when it would occur during period of state of emergency; extends eligibility for appointment as member of State Police and enrollment in SPRS for 160th Class of NJ State Police.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur in Assembly Amendments (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A3963 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A3963 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-01 | Senate | Approved P.L.2020, c.46. |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (36-0) |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2020-06-29 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (73-0-0) |
2020-06-29 | Assembly | Substituted for A3963 (1R) |
2020-06-25 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-06-25 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2020-04-13 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
2020-04-13 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2020-04-09 | Senate | Introduced, 1st Reading without Reference, 2nd Reading |
Same As/Similar To
A3963 (Same As) 2020-06-29 - Substituted by S2355 (1R)