NJ S2348 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-14)
Status: Passed on July 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-13 - Approved P.L.2017, c.105.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Includes students who participate in school intramural sports programs in the student-athlete head injury safety program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Includes students who participate in school intramural sports programs in the student-athlete head injury safety program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A3799 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-12 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-13AssemblyApproved P.L.2017, c.105.
2017-05-22AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (75-0-0)
2017-05-22AssemblySubstituted for A3799
2017-02-15AssemblyReceived in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
2017-02-13SenatePassed by the Senate (37-0)
2017-01-23SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2016-06-09SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee

Same As/Similar To

A3799 (Same As) 2017-05-22 - Substituted by S2348

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback