NJ S2347 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-22 - Approved P.L.2017, c.35.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Permits certain municipalities to impose and collect payroll tax of up to 1 percent of employer's payroll.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Permits certain municipalities to impose and collect payroll tax of up to 1 percent of employer's payroll.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 50 N: 25 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 28 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Adopt Governor Recommendations (Y: 28 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A3723 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 30 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-15 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-13 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-22AssemblyApproved P.L.2017, c.35.
2017-03-16AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (50-25-0)
2017-03-16AssemblyReceived in the Assembly on Concurrence with Gov. Recommend.
2017-03-13SenatePassed by the Senate (28-9)
2017-02-13Senate2nd Reading in the Senate on Concur. w/Governor's Recommend. (28-9)
2017-02-06SenateConditional Veto, Received in the Senate
2016-12-19AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (46-30-1)
2016-12-19AssemblySubstituted for A3723
2016-12-15AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2016-10-20AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2016-10-20SenatePassed by the Senate (27-9)
2016-10-13SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2016-06-09SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee

Same As/Similar To

A3723 (Same As) 2016-12-19 - Substituted by S2347

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback