NJ S2342 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on June 9 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Substituted by A4062 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes failure to maintain lane may constitute recklessness under reckless vehicular homicide statute; designated as Eileen's Law. **

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes failure to maintain lane may constitute recklessness under reckless vehicular homicide statute; designated as Eileen's Law. **

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-05 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-29 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-08SenateSubstituted by A4062 (2R)
2018-01-05SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2016-09-29SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2016-09-29SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2016-06-09SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4062 (Same As) 2018-01-08 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (65-1-1)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback