NJ S2334 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future A3713
Note: Carry Over of previous S3166
Note: Carry Over of previous A2805

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-06 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Clarifies disabled veterans and Purple Heart recipients are not required to own vehicle to be exempt from municipal parking meter fees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Clarifies disabled veterans and Purple Heart recipients are not required to own vehicle to be exempt from municipal parking meter fees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-10-06 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-10-06SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2022-03-21SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2334 (Carry Over) 2022-10-06 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
S3166 (Carry Over) 2021-11-15 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
A2805 (Carry Over) 2021-12-09 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A4007 (Same As) 2023-02-28 - Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback