NJ S2330 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on December 17 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-15 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee
Pending: Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 17 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-15 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee
Pending: Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows certain persons convicted of certain drug offenses to qualify for casino key employee license and casino employee registration. *
Title
Allows certain persons convicted of certain drug offenses to qualify for casino key employee license and casino employee registration. *
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Brown [R] | Sen. Jeff Van Drew [D] | Sen. Dawn Addiego [D] | Sen. Nilsa Cruz-Perez [D] |
Sen. Declan O'Scanlon [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-15 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee |
2018-12-17 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (37-0) |
2018-09-27 | Senate | Senate Amendment (32-0) (Brown) |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S4263 (Same As) 2020-01-09 - Substituted by A5817 (1R)