NJ S2317 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A4933

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on March 22 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-25 - Substituted by A3628 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes New Jersey Civic Information Consortium.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes New Jersey Civic Information Consortium.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Higher Eduction Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-25SenateSubstituted by A3628 (2R)
2018-06-25SenateSenate Amendment (29-0) (Weinberg)
2018-06-18SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-03-22SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee

Same As/Similar To

A3628 (Same As) 2018-06-30 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (52-22-0)
A4933 (Carry Over) 2017-06-05 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback