NJ S2316 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on September 30 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-15 - Senate Amendment (22-0) (Scutari)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 30 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-15 - Senate Amendment (22-0) (Scutari)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Bars solicitation of professional employment fo 30 days after date of accident or disaster under certain circumstances.**
Title
Bars solicitation of professional employment fo 30 days after date of accident or disaster under certain circumstances.**
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-09-26 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-15 | Senate Amendment (22-0) (Scutari) | |
2011-09-26 | Senate Amendment (37-0) (Scutari) | |
2010-11-15 | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading | |
2010-09-30 | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2190 (Same As) 2010-02-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee