NJ S2315 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A4663
Note: Carry Over of previous S1323
Note: Carry Over of previous S1323
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DCA to approve credentialing entity to develop and administer voluntary recovery residence certification program.
Title
Requires DCA to approve credentialing entity to develop and administer voluntary recovery residence certification program.
Sponsors
Sen. James Beach [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-25 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3230 (Same As) 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Community Development and Women's Affairs Committee
A4663 (Carry Over) 2022-09-29 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee
S1323 (Carry Over) 2022-02-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A4663 (Carry Over) 2022-09-29 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee
S1323 (Carry Over) 2022-02-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/S2315 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/S2500/2315_I1.HTM |