NJ S2314 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 22 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Substituted by A3723
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes and modifies clean energy and energy efficiency programs; modifies State's solar renewable energy portfolio standards.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes and modifies clean energy and energy efficiency programs; modifies State's solar renewable energy portfolio standards.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-05 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-12SenateSubstituted by A3723
2018-04-05SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-03-22SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee

Same As/Similar To

A3723 (Same As) 2018-05-23 - Approved P.L.2018, c.17.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback