NJ S2307 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on March 22 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-21 - Substituted by A3676 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Creates Garden State Growth Zone at Atlantic City International Airport and surrounding area; adjusts full-time employee designation requirements.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creates Garden State Growth Zone at Atlantic City International Airport and surrounding area; adjusts full-time employee designation requirements.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-21SenateSubstituted by A3676 (2R)
2018-06-18SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-05-14SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2018-05-14SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-03-22SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee

Same As/Similar To

A3676 (Same As) 2018-10-03 - Approved P.L.2018, c.120.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback