NJ S2299 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future A276
Note: Carry Foward to future S2549
Note: Carry Over of previous A4436
Note: Carry Over of previous S2718
Note: Carry Over of previous S555

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-21 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes "Student Mental Health Task Force."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes "Student Mental Health Task Force."

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-21SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2299 (Carry Over) 2022-03-21 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
S2299 (Carry Over) 2022-03-21 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
A3331 (Same As) 2022-03-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
A4436 (Carry Over) 2021-06-21 - Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
S2718 (Carry Over) 2021-06-21 - Substituted by A4436 (2R)
S555 (Carry Over) 2021-06-17 - Combined with S2718 (SCS)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback