NJ S2273 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-12)
Status: Passed on July 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Approved P.L.2020, c.44.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Requires SEHBP and eligible employers that do not participate in the SEHBP to provide certain plans for public education employees and certain public education retirees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires SEHBP and eligible employers that do not participate in the SEHBP to provide certain plans for public education employees and certain public education retirees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A20 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-01SenateApproved P.L.2020, c.44.
2020-06-29SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (38-0)
2020-06-29SenateReceived in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2020-06-29AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (73-0-0)
2020-06-29AssemblySubstituted for A20 (1R)
2020-06-25AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2020-06-25AssemblyTransferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2020-03-23AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Budget Committee
2020-03-19SenatePassed by the Senate (34-0)
2020-03-16SenateIntroduced, 1st Reading without Reference, 2nd Reading

Same As/Similar To

A20 (Same As) 2020-06-29 - Substituted by S2273 (1R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback