NJ S2265 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on September 27 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-10-15 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Allows deduction from New Jersey gross income of certain capital gains from sale or exchange of New Jersey qualified small business stock held for more than five years.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allows deduction from New Jersey gross income of certain capital gains from sale or exchange of New Jersey qualified small business stock held for more than five years.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-09-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-13 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-15AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2018-09-27SenatePassed by the Senate (38-1)
2018-09-13SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-03-08SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4393 (Same As) 2018-09-13 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback