NJ S2259 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A2390

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-07 - Substituted by A1217 (ACS/3R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

"Extreme Risk Protective Order Act of 2018."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

"Extreme Risk Protective Order Act of 2018."

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-04 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-07SenateSubstituted by A1217 (ACS/3R)
2018-06-04SenateReported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
2018-04-16SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2018-04-16SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-03-08SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee

Same As/Similar To

A1217 (Same As) 2018-06-13 - Approved P.L.2018, c.35.
A2390 (Carry Over) 2016-02-04 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback