NJ S2217 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A5958
Note: Carry Over of previous S4272
Note: Carry Over of previous S4272
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-11 - Substituted by A1537 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-11 - Substituted by A1537 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends economic recovery term under "Municipal Rehabilitation and Economic Recovery Act"; bars appeal of certain property assessments by Garden State Growth Zone Development Entity.
Title
Extends economic recovery term under "Municipal Rehabilitation and Economic Recovery Act"; bars appeal of certain property assessments by Garden State Growth Zone Development Entity.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-08 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-11 | Senate | Substituted by A1537 (1R) |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1537 (Same As) 2021-03-01 - Approved P.L.2021, c.30.
A5958 (Carry Over) 2020-01-09 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S4272 (Carry Over) 2020-01-13 - Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
A5958 (Carry Over) 2020-01-09 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S4272 (Carry Over) 2020-01-13 - Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading