NJ S2202 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S3411
Note: Carry Over of previous S2926
Note: Carry Over of previous S2926
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-09 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
Pending: Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-09 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
Pending: Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Modifies recordkeeping requirements for secondhand jewelry and precious metal transactions; increases penalties for violations.
Title
Modifies recordkeeping requirements for secondhand jewelry and precious metal transactions; increases penalties for violations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-09 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (35-1) |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2202 (Carry Over) 2021-06-09 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
S2926 (Carry Over) 2018-09-17 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S2926 (Carry Over) 2018-09-17 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee