NJ S2181 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 20 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-07 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Budget Committee
Pending: Assembly Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 20 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-07 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Budget Committee
Pending: Assembly Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases fine and imposes license suspension for talking or texting on hand-held device while driving.
Title
Increases fine and imposes license suspension for talking or texting on hand-held device while driving.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-12-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-07 | Reported and Referred to Assembly Budget Committee | |
2011-01-06 | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee | |
2010-12-20 | Passed by the Senate (30-7) | |
2010-11-15 | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2010-09-13 | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee | |
2010-09-13 | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading | |
2010-07-01 | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3154 (Same As) 2011-03-07 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Budget Committee