NJ S2179 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A3730

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Budget Committee
Pending: Assembly Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Allows gross income tax deduction for charitable contributions to certain New Jersey-based charitable organizations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allows gross income tax deduction for charitable contributions to certain New Jersey-based charitable organizations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Budget Committee
2019-03-25SenatePassed by the Senate (39-0)
2019-03-04SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-03-08SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee

Same As/Similar To

A307 (Same As) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Budget Committee
A3730 (Carry Over) 2016-05-19 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Budget Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback