NJ S2159 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S1614

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Transferred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Revises animal cruelty offenses and penalties concerning animal abandonment and failure to report injuring certain animals with a motor vehicle; increases civil penalties for certain other animal cruelty offenses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises animal cruelty offenses and penalties concerning animal abandonment and failure to report injuring certain animals with a motor vehicle; increases civil penalties for certain other animal cruelty offenses.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31SenateTransferred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
2018-03-05SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee

Same As/Similar To

S1614 (Carry Over) 2016-02-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
A4298 (Same As) 2018-06-30 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback